Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/15/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/19/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 08/01/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 08/02/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/26/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 09/26/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/09/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 07/25/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/16/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/18/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/17/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/17/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/17/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/17/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/17/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew