Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/15/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/15/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 10/03/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/08/2013
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 07/17/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/17/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/17/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/03/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 12/03/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew