Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/15/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/30/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/24/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew