Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/01/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/11/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/11/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/26/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/18/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/17/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew