Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 08/01/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/08/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/17/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/03/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew