Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/22/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 12/09/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/10/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/22/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew