Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/26/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/17/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/16/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew