Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/19/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 08/01/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/26/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/18/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/30/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/30/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/16/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/17/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/17/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/17/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 12/03/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 12/03/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew