Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/30/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/22/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 11/17/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew