Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/19/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 08/01/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/11/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/11/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/19/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 10/23/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/18/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew