Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/15/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/22/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/25/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/19/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/08/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/10/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/18/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew