Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/19/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/08/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/10/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew