Refine your search

Refined by:

Wisconsin Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/09/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/17/2014
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/17/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/17/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew