Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/15/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 07/15/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/15/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/15/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/15/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/15/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/15/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/15/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/19/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/19/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/22/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/22/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/25/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/25/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/25/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/30/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/31/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/31/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/31/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 08/01/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 08/02/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 08/02/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/02/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/11/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/11/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/11/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/11/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/11/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 09/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/19/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/26/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/26/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 09/30/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 10/03/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/08/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 10/08/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 10/23/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 12/09/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 01/08/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/08/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/17/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 07/17/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/18/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/22/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/22/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/24/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/25/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/25/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 07/25/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/29/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/29/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/10/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 09/16/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/16/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/17/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/17/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/17/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/17/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/17/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/17/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/17/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/17/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/17/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 11/17/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/17/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 11/17/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/17/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/17/2014
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/17/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 11/17/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/17/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 11/17/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/17/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/03/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/03/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/03/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 12/03/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 12/03/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew