Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/27/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/27/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/27/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/28/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/28/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/28/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/28/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/28/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/28/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/28/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/28/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/28/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/28/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/28/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 06/28/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/28/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/28/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/08/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/09/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/17/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/17/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/17/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 07/17/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/18/2013