Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/28/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/28/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/09/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/09/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/09/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 07/09/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/09/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/10/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/10/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/10/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/10/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/10/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/10/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/10/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/10/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/10/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/11/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/17/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/19/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/24/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/24/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 07/24/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/24/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/24/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 08/02/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/17/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/17/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 09/26/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/15/2013