Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 07/31/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/09/2013