Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/10/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/10/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/10/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/10/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/10/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/16/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/24/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/01/2013