Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/16/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/16/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/18/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 09/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/11/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/11/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/23/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/23/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 09/25/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/25/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/25/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 09/27/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/27/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/27/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/27/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/27/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/27/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/24/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/13/2013