Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/22/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/30/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/09/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/09/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/17/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/28/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 10/28/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/28/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/29/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/12/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/21/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/21/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 12/02/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/02/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/02/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 12/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/12/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/03/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/04/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/10/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/10/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/11/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/18/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 03/18/2014