Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 07/19/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/24/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/17/2013