Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 07/22/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/22/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/23/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/24/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 08/02/2013