Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 10/28/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/10/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/03/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/11/2014