Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 09/18/2013