Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/17/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 06/19/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/20/2013