Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/17/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/20/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/27/2013