Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/20/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/25/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/25/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/26/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/30/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/01/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/09/2013