There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing that access to hospitals and other health care providers for patients in rural areas of the United States is essential to the survival and success of communities in the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/25/2013 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
09/27/2013 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
09/25/2013 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
09/25/2013 Introduced in House

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/25/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/27/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/27/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/30/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/01/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/28/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/22/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/03/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/27/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 06/17/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/17/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/25/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health09/27/2013 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (8)

  • Congressional tributes
  • Health care coverage and access
  • Health care quality
  • Health personnel
  • Hospital care
  • Medicare
  • Rural conditions and development

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.356. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/25/2013)

Recognizes that: (1) access to hospitals and other health care providers for patients in rural areas of the United States is essential to the survival and success of U.S. communities; (2) preserving and strengthening access to quality health care in rural areas is crucial to the success and prosperity of the United States; (3) strengthening access to hospitals and other health care providers for patients in rural areas makes Medicare more cost-effective and improves health outcomes for patients, and (4) rural health care providers are integral to the local economies and are one of the largest types of employers in rural areas of the United States.

Celebrates the many dedicated medical professionals across the United States who work hard each day to deliver quality care to people living in rural areas.