Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/07/2014