Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/25/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/27/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/27/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/30/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/01/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/28/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/22/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/03/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/27/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/26/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 06/17/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/17/2014