Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/29/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/29/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/25/2014