Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/06/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew