Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/14/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/09/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/10/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/17/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/06/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/13/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 09/23/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 12/10/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew