Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/06/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/27/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/18/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/09/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew