Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/12/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/27/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/11/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew