Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/04/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/06/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew