Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/05/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/11/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/26/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/06/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/07/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew