Refine your search

Refined by:

South Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 10/28/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew