There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives commending efforts by the United States to resolve the Israeli-Palestinian conflict through a negotiated two-state solution.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/27/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
09/27/2013Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
09/27/2013Introduced in House

Cosponsors (122)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/27/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/01/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/01/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/01/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/01/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/01/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/01/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/01/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/01/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/01/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/01/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/01/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/01/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 10/02/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/02/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/02/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/02/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 10/02/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/02/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 10/02/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/04/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/04/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/04/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/04/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/09/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/09/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/09/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 10/10/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 10/10/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/16/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/16/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 10/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/16/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 10/22/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/30/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 10/30/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/13/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/13/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 11/13/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/15/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/15/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/04/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/04/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/14/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 02/05/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/26/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 02/26/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/11/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/26/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/28/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs09/27/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.365.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.365. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/27/2013)

Expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that: (1) achievement of a two-state solution that enhances stability and security in the Middle East can ensure Israel's survival as a secure Jewish and democratic state and fulfill the legitimate aspirations of the Palestinian people for a state of their own; and (2) while the United States remains indispensable to any viable effort to achieve that goal, only the Israelis and the Palestinians can make the choices necessary to end their conflict.

Commends Secretary of State Kerry for his efforts with Israeli, Palestinian, and other Arab leaders to advance a negotiated two-state solution.

Supports a U.S. diplomatic initiative to facilitate direct negotiations between the Israelis and Palestinians, with the support of other Arab states and the international community, to reach an agreement to end their conflict.