Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/04/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/09/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/16/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 12/04/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/14/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/26/2014