Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/01/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/04/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/04/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/04/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 12/04/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 12/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/26/2014