Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/21/2013