Text: H.Res.365 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/27/2013)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 365 Introduced in House (IH)]

113th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 365

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives commending efforts 
   by the United States to resolve the Israeli-Palestinian conflict 
                through a negotiated two-state solution.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                           September 27, 2013

Ms. Schakowsky (for herself, Mr. Waxman, and Mr. Nadler) submitted the 
 following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign 
                                Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives commending efforts 
   by the United States to resolve the Israeli-Palestinian conflict 
                through a negotiated two-state solution.

Whereas the special relationship between the United States and Israel is rooted 
        in shared national security interests and shared values of democracy, 
        human rights, and the rule of law;
Whereas the United States has worked for decades to strengthen Israel's security 
        through assistance and cooperation on defense and intelligence matters 
        in order to enhance the safety of United States citizens and Israelis;
Whereas the United States remains unwavering in its commitment to help Israel 
        address the myriad challenges our ally faces, including threats from 
        anti-Israel terrorist organizations, regional instability, horrifying 
        violence in neighboring states, and preventing a nuclear-armed Iran;
Whereas, the United States continues to seek a permanent, two-state solution to 
        resolve the conflict between the Israelis and the Palestinians;
Whereas for 20 years, Presidents of the United States from both political 
        parties and Israeli Prime Ministers have supported attaining a peace 
        agreement that establishes a Palestinian state, coexisting side-by-side 
        with Israel in peace and security;
Whereas ending the Israeli-Palestinian conflict is vital to the interests of 
        both parties;
Whereas delays to a political solution to the conflict between Israelis and 
        Palestinians pose a threat to the ability to maintain a Jewish and 
        democratic state of Israel;
Whereas Israeli Prime Minister Netanyahu said on April 17, 2013, ``We are 
        committed to our aspiration for peace, a peace that will be based on the 
        principle of two states for two peoples, a Jewish state alongside a 
        demilitarized Palestinian state.'';
Whereas on April 29, 2013, speaking on behalf of an Arab League delegation, 
        Qatari Prime Minister Sheikh Hamad bin Jassim bin Jabr Al Thani 
        announced support for efforts to reach a peace agreement between Israel 
        and the Palestinians, calling it ``a strategic choice for the Arab 
        state'';
Whereas Palestinian Authority President Mahmoud Abbas reportedly said on August 
        22, 2013, ``Signing the agreement will signal the end of the 
        conflict.'';
Whereas on May 28, 2013, United States Secretary of State John F. Kerry 
        announced a multilateral plan to revitalize the Palestinian economy, 
        thereby demonstrating goodwill to the Palestinian people as they commit 
        to peace negotiations; and
Whereas on July 29, 2013, the Israelis and Palestinians engaged in face-to-face 
        talks, moving toward a resumption of formal negotiations on the Israeli-
        Palestinian conflict's final status issues: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That--
            (1) it is the sense of the House of Representatives that--
                    (A) achievement of a two-state solution that 
                enhances stability and security in the Middle East 
                can--
                            (i) ensure the State of Israel's survival 
                        as a secure Jewish and democratic state; and
                            (ii) fulfill the legitimate aspirations of 
                        the Palestinian people for a state of their 
                        own; and
                    (B) while the United States remains indispensable 
                to any viable effort to achieve that goal, only the 
                Israelis and the Palestinians can make the difficult 
                choices necessary to end their conflict;
            (2) the House of Representatives--
                    (A) commends Secretary of State John F. Kerry for 
                his tireless efforts with Israeli, Palestinian, and 
                other Arab leaders to urgently advance a negotiated 
                two-state solution; and
                    (B) pledges its support for a United States 
                diplomatic initiative to help facilitate direct 
                negotiations between the Israelis and Palestinians, 
                with the support of other Arab states and the 
                International community, to reach an agreement to end 
                their conflict.
                                 <all>