There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives regarding sexually exploited and trafficked girls in the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/22/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/09/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
10/22/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
10/22/2013Introduced in House

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/22/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/22/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/09/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/22/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations01/09/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.387.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.387. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/22/2013)

Expresses support for efforts to: (1) provide protections and supports for sexually exploited and trafficked girls in the United States, and (2) create criminal or civil penalties for anyone who buys or sells a child through a system of child trafficking.