There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing support for designation of the third Tuesday of November as "National Entrepreneurs Day".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/30/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/01/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade.
10/30/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
10/30/2013Introduced in House

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/30/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/12/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/12/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/15/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 11/15/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 11/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/18/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/19/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/19/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/03/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/14/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/30/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade11/01/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.401. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/30/2013)

Expresses support for the designation of National Entrepreneurs Day.

Recognizes the considerable contributions of entrepreneurs to the United States. Honors those entrepreneurs who ignite innovation and inspire the next generation.