Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 11/13/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/19/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 11/19/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/19/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/10/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 07/31/2014