There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Praising India's rich religious diversity and commitment to tolerance and equality, and reaffirming the need to protect the rights and freedoms of religious minorities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/18/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
01/09/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
11/18/2013Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/18/2013Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/18/2013Introduced in House

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 11/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/20/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/22/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/22/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/22/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/02/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/10/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 12/10/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/21/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/28/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/04/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/08/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/09/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/09/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 06/23/2014
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 11/18/2013 12/05/2013 --
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 11/21/2013 02/11/2014 --

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/18/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary11/18/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice01/09/2014 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security01/09/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.417.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.417. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/18/2013)

Recognizes the suffering of Indian citizens who have been victims of religious violence.

Calls for religious freedom and related human rights to be included in the United States-India Strategic Dialogue and for such issues to be raised directly with federal and state Indian government officials.

Declares that the House of Representatives shares the opinion of the Department of State and the U.S. Commission on International Religious Freedom that the Gujarat government has not adequately pursued justice for the victims of religious violence in 2002 and expresses concern regarding reports about the complicity of local officials.

Commends the U.S. government for exercising its authority in 2005 under the International Religious Freedom Act of 1998 to deny a U.S. visa to Narendra Modi on the grounds of religious freedom violations, and encourages it to review the applications of any individuals implicated in such violations under the same standard.

Commends the role of India's National Human Rights Commission and the Indian Supreme Court, which has led to some convictions in Gujarat riot cases and the arrest of high-level leaders in the Gujarati administration.

Calls on India to: (1) increase training on human rights and religious freedom standards and practices for police and the judiciary; and (2) empower the National Commission on Minorities with enforcement mechanisms.

Calls on Gujarat and other Indian states with anti-conversion laws to repeal such legislation and ensure freedom to practice, propagate, and profess religion as enshrined in the Indian constitution.

Encourages the establishment of an impartial body of interfaith religious leaders, human rights advocates, legal experts, and government officials to discuss and recommend actions to promote religious tolerance and understanding.

Urges all political parties and religious organizations to publicly oppose the exploitation of religious differences and denounce harassment and violence against religious minorities.