Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/22/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/22/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/10/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/21/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/28/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/04/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/28/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew