Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/18/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/20/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/20/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/19/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 12/19/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/07/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/10/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/14/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/15/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/27/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/04/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/11/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/25/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/26/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/27/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/28/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/06/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/12/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/13/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/14/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 03/24/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/24/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/02/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/02/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/09/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/09/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/06/2014