Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 11/20/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/21/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 12/11/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/17/2014